WY HB0137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Hathaway scholarship program; modifying the Hathaway success curriculum; requiring a study; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hathaway eligibility requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |