WY HB0136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - COW:Failed 21-36-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - COW:Failed 21-36-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public school finance; modifying the education resource block grant model to provide additional funding to certain school districts for teacher positions; modifying a definition; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School district teacher adjustment.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Crank [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] |
Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - COW:Failed 21-36-3-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | COW:Failed 21-36-3-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |