WY HB0135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; creating a program to provide compensation for people injured by a grizzly bear attack in the state; authorizing voluntary payments to the program; creating an account; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hunting licenses-donation to grizzly bear attack victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - H06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 2-6-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-23 | House | H06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 2-6-1-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |