WY HB0135 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 27 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 27 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for resident lifetime archery licenses; providing for fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Lifetime archery licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Blackburn [R] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Rep. Amy Edmonds [R] |
Rep. Gerald Gay [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Garry Piiparinen [R] |
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 27 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0024 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2015-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2015-02-18 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0024 | |
2015-02-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-12 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |