WY HB0134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to brands; amending procedures regarding brands as specified; creating a permanently recorded brand; requiring rulemaking; repealing unnecessary provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock brands-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Adopted HB0134JC001: 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0134JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 148
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0093
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0093
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0093
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0093
2019-02-20SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-20HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-20HouseConcur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0
2019-02-19HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2019-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-08SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-04House3rd Reading:Passed 55-3-2-0-0
2019-02-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-31HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback