WY HB0133 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring passage of an examination on the principles of the constitution of the United States and the state of Wyoming to receive a high school diploma, associate degree, baccalaureate degree or high school equivalency certificate; specifying examination requirements and composition; providing legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Civics proficiency examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |