WY HB0131 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; clarifying that the build Wyoming loan program is a revolving, continuing loan program; clarifying the amount of funds that may be loaned to political subdivisions for infrastructure projects and road or street projects; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Build Wyoming-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 112
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0046
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0046
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0046
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0046
2019-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0
2019-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-29SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback