WY HB0131 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Bonner, Brechtel, Brown, Byrd, Childers, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Stubson, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Blikre, Botten, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Madden, Patton, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Teeters, Throne, Vranish and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Buchanan and Lubnau. Ayes 27 Nays 31 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Bonner, Brechtel, Brown, Byrd, Childers, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Stubson, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Blikre, Botten, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Madden, Patton, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Teeters, Throne, Vranish and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Buchanan and Lubnau. Ayes 27 Nays 31 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to labor and employment; requiring employees to share tips and gratuities as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tip sharing.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Sen. Leland Christensen [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Rep. Keith Gingery [R] |
Sen. Kit Jennings [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Bonner, Brechtel, Brown, Byrd, Childers, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Stubson, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Blikre, Botten, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Madden, Patton, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Teeters, Throne, Vranish and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Buchanan and Lubnau. Ayes 27 Nays 31 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-02-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-31 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Byrd, Greear, Kasperik, Lockhart, Moniz, Roscoe, Stubson, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv. Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-31 | (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Rereferred to H09 | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0131.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0131.pdf |