WY HB0130 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public pensions; amending benefit computations from the paid firemen's pension account as specified; creating accounts for contributions of members with more than twenty-five years of service credit; providing for distributions from the account; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Firemen's pension account-benefit adjustment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 |
2015-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-28 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |