WY HB0129 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 111 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to agriculture; extending the Wyoming Food Freedom Act to apply to home processed food; authorizing sales of certain meat products and animals under the act; allowing transactions at producers' homes; amending definitions; authorizing agencies to provide requested assistance to producers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food freedom act-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06 Chapter No. 111 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-06 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-06 Governor Signed HEA No. 0055
2017-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0055
2017-02-24HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0055
2017-02-23 Assigned Number HEA No. 0055
2017-02-22HouseConcur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2017-02-21HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2017-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-03SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-03SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2017-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2017-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-27HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-26HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-26HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2017-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback