WY HB0127 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 129 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Chapter No. 129 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to payment of wages; providing that wages due an employee who quits shall be paid as scheduled for regular payroll; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Termination of employment-wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Chapter No. 129 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0086 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0086 |
2015-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0086 |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0086 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |