WY HB0127 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to veterans; specifying a procedure for placing a veteran designation on driver's licenses and identification cards; specifying duties of the veterans' commission; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses-veterans designation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0113
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0113
2013-02-26 Assigned Number HEA0113
2013-02-26HouseDid Concur
2013-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-07SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08
2013-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-22HousePassed CoW
2013-01-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-22HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-18HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08
2013-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback