WY HB0126 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to limited liability companies; authorizing limited liability companies to establish series of members, managers, transferable interests or assets as specified; specifying powers; providing for limitations on liabilities; providing for management, termination and dissolution; authorizing distributions to members; imposing a requirement on foreign limited liability companies that establish series; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Limited liability companies-series.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2018-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0024 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0024 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-4-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |