WY HB0126 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0057
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; providing that a candidate's campaign committee may file reports for the candidate as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Candidate filing requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0057
2015-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0057
2015-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0057
2015-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2015-02-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-23 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-19SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-19 Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0
2015-02-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-03HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-30 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0
2015-01-29HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-29 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0
2015-01-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-20HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback