WY HB0126 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to limited liability companies; authorizing limited liability companies to establish series of members, managers, transferable interests or assets as specified; specifying powers; providing for limitations on liabilities; providing for management, termination and dissolution; authorizing distributions to members; imposing a requirement on foreign limited liability companies that establish series; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited liability companies-series.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-4-0-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0024
2018-03-07HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0024
2018-03-06 Assigned Number HEA No. 0024
2018-03-06HouseConcur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-05HouseReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2018-03-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-01SenateCOW:Passed
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on General File
2018-03-01SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2018-02-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2018-02-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-20House3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0
2018-02-19House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-16HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-15HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 56-4-0-0-0
2018-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback