WY HB0125 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to district courts; amending filing and other fees for probate and civil cases as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
District court filing fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Rep. William Pownall [R] |
Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 171 | |
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0103 | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0103 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0103 |
2019-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0103 | |
2019-02-25 | House | Concur:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-15 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |