WY HB0123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; providing for reimbursement of legislators to attend out of state conferences as specified; authorizing the management council to adopt policies; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legislator conference travel.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] |
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - H12 - Rules:Do Pass Failed 3-10-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-10 | House | H12 - Rules:Do Pass Failed 3-10-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |