WY HB0122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; increasing conservation stamp fees; establishing a new account within the game and fish fund; depositing fee increases as specified; authorizing expenditure of fee as specified; imposing game and fish commission reporting requirements on specified account expenditures; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hunting and fishing access-reliable funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Clausen [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Rep. Cyrus Western [R] |
Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Concur:Passed 36-20-4-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 73 | |
2021-04-02 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0046 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2021-03-30 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0046 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Concur:Passed 36-20-4-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-23 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 |
2021-03-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-05 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2021-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |