WY HB0120 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; providing for random drug testing of state employees holding specified positions; providing for testing of new employees; specifying certain procedures and minimum requirements; authorizing policies; providing for disciplinary action; providing for self-reporting of controlled substance use; providing for confidentiality; requiring a report; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Employee drug testing-vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] | Rep. Lee Filer [D] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0120.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0120.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0120.htm |