WY HB0120 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public meetings; providing notice requirements for special meetings; providing for audio recording of executive sessions; providing for proceedings to review executive sessions; providing for notice of executive sessions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-28 - Senate - Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Reconsider failed 13-17; (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - Senate - S Lay back failed 11-19; (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-28 Failed 3rd Reading
2011-02-28 Reconsider failed 13-17;
2011-02-15 (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-09 (S) Rereferred to S06
2011-02-02 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2011-02-02 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-31 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-28 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-27 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-25 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-25 (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-17 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2011-01-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback