WY HB0119 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 120 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to genetic information privacy; prohibiting the collection, retention and disclosure of genetic information without informed consent as specified; providing exceptions; providing for the retention and destruction of genetic information; providing a criminal penalty; providing for a civil cause of action; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetic information privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Chapter No. 120 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
2018-03-16 Governor Signed HEA No. 0060
2018-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number 120
2018-03-10SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0060
2018-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0060
2018-03-09 Assigned Number HEA No. 0060
2018-03-09HouseConcur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-08HouseReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-08Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-03-07Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-06SenateCOW:Passed
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on General File
2018-03-05SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-03-02Senate:Rerefer to S04 - Education
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2018-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-19HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-19HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2018-02-16House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2018-02-16HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 60-0-0-0-0
2018-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback