WY HB0119 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the department of family services; repealing obsolete provisions related to transportation of children and payments to facilities; amending the Juvenile Justice Act, the Children in Need of Supervision Act and Wyoming boys' school statutes to delete references to placement at the Wyoming State Hospital and Wyoming Life Resource Center; updating references to the food stamp program with references to the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP); and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of family services programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0112
2013-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0112
2013-02-26 Assigned Number HEA0112
2013-02-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-22SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-13SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01
2013-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-21HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-17HousePassed CoW
2013-01-17 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-17HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-16HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01
2013-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback