WY HB0118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming community college commission; requiring the development of a funding model for state appropriations; requiring further process refinement and imposing reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-community college commission budget request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-03 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-30 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2015-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |