WY HB0117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; entering into a compact with other states to allow licensed occupational therapist and licensed occupational therapy assistants licensed in one compact state to exercise a multistate licensure privilege in other states that are party to the compact; authorizing rulemaking by the compact commission; retaining authority to license occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants only in this state; approving and specifying terms of the compact; making conforming amendments; providing for criminal history background checks; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Occupational therapy licensure compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Concur:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number 54 | |
2022-03-11 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0034 | |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2022-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0034 | |
2022-03-08 | House | Concur:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-02 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-21 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 54-5-1-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |