WY HB0117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0051
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0051
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administrative procedure; requiring an agency to complete an assessment evaluating whether a proposed administrative rule is a regulatory taking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Administrative rules-takings assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0051 |
2013-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0051 |
2013-02-19 | Assigned Number HEA0051 | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-22 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |