WY HB0116 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cities, towns and counties; creating a program to provide assistance to local governments impacted by energy development as specified; providing authority to the state loan and investment board to issue grants to local governments to address the effects of industrial projects or energy development; providing authority for the office of state lands and investments to administer the program; granting rulemaking authority; providing definitions; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impact assistance to local governments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-05 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H02 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
2012-03-05 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-05 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-03-02 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-29 (S) Introduced and Referred to S02
2012-02-29 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-20 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-20 (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-17 (H) Introduced and Referred to H02
2012-02-15 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback