WY HB0115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - COW:Failed 25-31-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to civil and criminal liability; providing immunity from civil liability and criminal prosecution for entering a vehicle to render emergency assistance; providing an exception; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lifesaving measures-immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - COW:Failed 25-31-4-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseCOW:Failed 25-31-4-0-0
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback