WY HB0115 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for a voter petition to request the imposition of a specific purpose excise tax as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Specific purpose excise tax-voter petition.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Buchanan [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Rep. Seth Carson [D] | Rep. Peter Illoway [R] |
Sen. Marty Martin [D] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Rep. Lori Millin [D] | Rep. Bryan Pedersen [R] |
Sen. Tony Ross [R] | Rep. Matt Teeters [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Rereferred to S08;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-22 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S03 | |
2010-02-22 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-17 | (H03) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03 | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0115.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/HB0115.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0115.htm |