WY HB0114 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; revising provisions related to improvements made by a lessee of state lands; extending the maximum length of certain leases of state lands; authorizing leases for residential purposes; specifying that leases are required to comply with minimum state standards; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leasing and sale of state lands-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06HouseCOW:H Did not consider for COW
2023-02-02HousePlaced on General File
2023-02-02HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2023-01-27House:Rerefer to H03 - Revenue
2023-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2023-01-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2023-01-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback