WY HB0114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal law; providing legislative declaration that portions of the National Defense Authorization Act of 2012 are unconstitutional; prohibiting enforcement of federal law as specified; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Liberty Preservation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0114.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0114.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0114.htm |