WY HB0113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to electric utilities; providing requirements for service agreements between electric utilities and customers with specified electrical demands; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special electric utility agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-2-4-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-1-0-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 160
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEA No. 0102
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0102
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0102
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0102
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-19SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22House3rd Reading:Passed 54-2-4-0-0
2019-01-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-17HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-1-0-1
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback