WY HB0112 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; providing for notification of permit revisions; establishing time limits on mine permit application or revision reviews; limiting requests for additional information on mine permits applications or revisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Mining permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Byrd Excused: Representative(s) Davison and Goggles. Ayes 57 Nays 1 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-19 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Greear, Kasperik, Lockhart, Moniz, Roscoe, Stubson, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv. Nayes: Representative(s) Byrd Ayes 8 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-19 | (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H09 | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0112.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0112.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/HB0112.pdf |