WY HB0111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to environmental quality; specifying voting procedures of the environmental quality council; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental quality council-voting amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 133
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0075
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0075
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0075
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0075
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-01-29SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25House3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0
2019-01-24House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-23HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback