WY HB0110 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax; revising the distribution of sales and use tax as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sales tax distributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0110.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0110.pdf |