WY HB0108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the tax on production of energy from wind resources; increasing the tax rate; providing for distribution of the tax; repealing the three year tax exemption on energy production; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wind energy production tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Theodore Blackburn [R] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-04 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2021-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |