WY HB0107 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to chiropractic practice; providing for use of the title chiropractic physician; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title of chiropractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0- (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-03 H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-8-0-
2017-02-03HouseNo report prior to COW Cutoff
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback