WY HB0106 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; establishing the Wyoming education options act; authorizing reimbursement of private school costs for students; providing rulemaking authority; requiring reports; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming education options act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2021-03-24HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2021-03-17HouseH04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0
2021-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2021-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-04 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback