WY HB0103 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to career-technical education; providing for a task force to study and prepare plans for implementation of a career-technical education student scholarship program; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merit career-technical scholarships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateDid Not Consider for Introduction
2015-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-04House3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0
2015-02-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-29 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2015-01-22HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-22 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2015-01-20HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback