WY HB0102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - COW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; authorizing preference points for persons who complete a hunter safety course as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunter safety course-preference points.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - COW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseCOW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-16House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback