WY HB0101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to local powers; authorizing joint powers boards to create and operate natural gas systems; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint powers boards-natural gas service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 118
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0072
2019-02-22SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0072
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0072
2019-02-21 Assigned Number HEA No. 0072
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-14SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23House3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0
2019-01-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-17HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback