WY HB0101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to charter schools; authorizing the community college commission to oversee and approve the operation of charter schools; requiring training; eliminating school district approval of the operation of charter schools; creating an application fee; providing transition for existing charter schools; providing an appropriation; and providing effective dates.
Title
Education-charter schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Wilson [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Sen. Fred Emerich [R] |
Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2015-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0101.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0101.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0101.pdf |