WY HB0101 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; imposing a tax upon the production of electricity from wind resources as specified; providing for administration, imposition, enforcement and distribution as specified; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electricity generated from wind-taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0018 | |
2010-03-02 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0018 | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0018 | |
2010-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0018 | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-15 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-15 | (H03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03 | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |