WY HB0100 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 159 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to fuel taxes; restricting the expenditure of a specified portion of fuel taxes; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0100JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0100JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0100JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0100JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 17-40-3-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 17-40-3-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 159 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0100
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0100
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0100
2015-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0100
2015-03-04SenateAdopted HB0100JC001: 29-0-1-0-0
2015-03-04HouseAdopted HB0100JC001: 56-3-1-0-0
2015-03-02SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-27HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-27HouseConcur:Failed 17-40-3-0-0
2015-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-02-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-12 Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2015-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-26House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2015-01-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-22HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-21HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-21 Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2015-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback