WY HB0099 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - 3rd Reading:Failed 24-36-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - 3rd Reading:Failed 24-36-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to general statutory provisions; providing that statutes, memorials and resolutions shall be written in gender neutral terms as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Statutes-gender neutral terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 24-36-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 24-36-0-0-0 |
2015-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-26 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0099.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0099.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0099.pdf |