WY HB0097 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 112 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to agriculture; creating a gray wolf depredation compensation program; imposing additional duties on the department of agriculture; authorizing rulemaking; providing for termination of the program as specified; requiring a report upon termination; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wolf depredation compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0097JC001: 21-7-1-0-1 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0097JC001: 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0097JC001: 21-7-1-0-1 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0097JC001: 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-0-0-1 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-0-0-1 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 112 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed HEA No. 0052
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0052
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0052
2016-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0052
2016-03-04SenateAdopted HB0097JC001: 21-7-1-0-1
2016-03-04HouseAdopted HB0097JC001: 58-2-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-02HouseConcur:Failed 0-58-2-0-0
2016-03-02HouseReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-0-0-1
2016-03-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-26SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2016-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-16HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-16HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-16 H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12 H06 - Travel:Rerefer to H05 - Agriculture
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 53-5-2-0-0
2016-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback