WY HB0097 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; modifying the process for adoption of content and performance standards by the state board; establishing an advisory council to the state board for adoption of the content and performance standards; prohibiting participation in the Smarter Balanced Assessment Consortium; prohibiting expenditure of federal American Recovery and Reinvestment Act funds; establishing state education data security policies and protocols; imposing penalty; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education-state administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-21HouseDid Not Consider in COW
2014-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-18HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04
2014-02-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback