WY HB0095 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; imposing penalties for failure to properly title or register a vehicle; establishing procedures for nonpayment of fines; establishing a lien for unpaid fines; limiting an exemption to vehicle registration requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle registration—penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-25 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2017-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |