WY HB0094 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to parents; providing for a parental right to direct the upbringing, education and care of a child; providing applicability as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateDid Not Consider for Introduction
2015-02-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2015-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-27HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-23 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback