WY HB0094 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to easements; exempting options for easements from provision requiring certain specifications for easements; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property easements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed HEA No. 0050
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0050
2010-03-04 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0050
2010-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0050
2010-03-03 (H) Did Concur
2010-03-03 (H) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-03 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-02 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-03-01 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-26 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (S09) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-23 (S) Introduced and Referred to S09
2010-02-22 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-22 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-22 (H) Advanced to 3rd Reading on Same Day
2010-02-22 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-19 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-17 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-17 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-11 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2010-02-10 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback