WY HB0093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to counties, cities and towns; authorizing the establishment of tourism improvement districts as specified; specifying requirements; providing definitions; specifying duties and powers of tourism improvement districts; authorizing assessments; providing for a limitation on actions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism improvement districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-26-2-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateCOW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 32-26-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback